THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:37:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Philippines, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE, FILIPINO

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 202
2464 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 252-9861
Extension: 3
Fax: (519) 252-6336
Address: 2464 Howard Ave
Suite 204
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 973-4411
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 19 Sep 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 15 May 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 19 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 15 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hanle O. Yap Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Feb 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Yap (CPSO#: 77771 )
Business Address: 1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
(519) 973-4411
Business Address: 1407 Ottawa Street
Windsor Ontario N8X 2G1
(519) 258-4356
Business Address: 204-2464 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V6
(519) 987-0611
Business Address: 2464 Howard Avenue
Suite 202
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V6
(519) 252-9861 Extn: 3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE, FILIPINO
Medical School: University of the Philippines, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 202
2464 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 252-9861
Extension: 3
Fax: (519) 252-6336
Address: 2464 Howard Ave
Suite 204
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 973-4411
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 19 Sep 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 15 May 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 19 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 15 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hanle O. Yap Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Feb 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Yap (CPSO#: 77771 )
Business Address: 1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
(519) 973-4411
Business Address: 1407 Ottawa Street
Windsor Ontario N8X 2G1
(519) 258-4356
Business Address: 204-2464 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V6
(519) 987-0611
Business Address: 2464 Howard Avenue
Suite 202
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V6
(519) 252-9861 Extn: 3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HANLE ONG YAP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAP is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HANLE ONG YAP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAP is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Philippines, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2002
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jun 2002