THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:51:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 128 Main Street East
Shelburne Ontario L9V 3K5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2262599000
Fax: 2264860126
Address: 100 Rolling Hills Drive
Headwaters Health Care Centre
Orangeville Ontario L9W 6T6
Phone: (519) 941-2410
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amy Catania Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Dec 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Catania (CPSO#: 77780 )
Business Address: 128 Main Street East
Shelburne Ontario L9V 3K5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 128 Main Street East
Shelburne Ontario L9V 3K5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2262599000
Fax: 2264860126
Address: 100 Rolling Hills Drive
Headwaters Health Care Centre
Orangeville Ontario L9W 6T6
Phone: (519) 941-2410
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amy Catania Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Dec 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Catania (CPSO#: 77780 )
Business Address: 128 Main Street East
Shelburne Ontario L9V 3K5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMY MARGARET KATHLEEN CATANIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CATANIA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMY MARGARET KATHLEEN CATANIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CATANIA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jan 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002