THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:53:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 18 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 18 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Natalie R Gomperts Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jan 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Gomperts (CPSO#: 77782 )
Business Address: 1120 Finch Ave W
Healthy Way MDC Inc.
North York ON M3J 3H7
(647) 890-2375
Business Address: 404-191 McNaughton Rd E
Healthy Way MDC Inc.
Maple ON L6A 4E2
(647) 890-2375
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6100
Business Address: 2100 Finch Avenue West
Suite 108
Toronto Ontario M3N 2Z9
(416) 667-9598
Business Address: 2 Champagne Drive
Toronto Ontario M3J 0K2
4162226160 Extn: 243

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 18 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 18 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Natalie R Gomperts Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jan 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Gomperts (CPSO#: 77782 )
Business Address: 1120 Finch Ave W
Healthy Way MDC Inc.
North York ON M3J 3H7
(647) 890-2375
Business Address: 404-191 McNaughton Rd E
Healthy Way MDC Inc.
Maple ON L6A 4E2
(647) 890-2375
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6100
Business Address: 2100 Finch Avenue West
Suite 108
Toronto Ontario M3N 2Z9
(416) 667-9598
Business Address: 2 Champagne Drive
Toronto Ontario M3J 0K2
4162226160 Extn: 243

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATALIE ROSANNE GOMPERTS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOMPERTS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATALIE ROSANNE GOMPERTS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOMPERTS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002