THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:48:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B 5A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 474-8600
Extension: 2934
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Scott Kerrigan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kerrigan (CPSO#: 77792 )
Business Address: North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B 5A4
(705) 474-8600

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B 5A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 474-8600
Extension: 2934
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Scott Kerrigan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kerrigan (CPSO#: 77792 )
Business Address: North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B 5A4
(705) 474-8600

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SCOTT ANDREW JOHN KERRIGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KERRIGAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SCOTT ANDREW JOHN KERRIGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KERRIGAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jan 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002