THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 04:49:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GERMAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2109 Ottawa Street
Windsor Ontario N8Y 3K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-254-4154
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Reimer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Reimer (CPSO#: 77805 )
Business Address: 100-2 Gurdwara Rd
Nepean ON K2E 1A2
Business Address: 802 - 803
1280 Old Innes Road
Ottawa Ontario K1B 5M7
(613) 366-2021

Corporation Name: Mark Reimer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Dec 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GERMAN
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2109 Ottawa Street
Windsor Ontario N8Y 3K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-254-4154
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Reimer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Reimer (CPSO#: 77805 )
Business Address: 100-2 Gurdwara Rd
Nepean ON K2E 1A2
Business Address: 802 - 803
1280 Old Innes Road
Ottawa Ontario K1B 5M7
(613) 366-2021

Corporation Name: Mark Reimer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Dec 2018

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK WILLIAM REIMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REIMER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK WILLIAM REIMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REIMER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002