THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 09:41:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GUJARATI, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michael's Hospital
Dept of Ophthalmology & Vision Sci
Suite 801
61 Queen Street East
Toronto Ontario M5C 2T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 867-7411
Fax: (416) 867-7491
Address: 4100 Yonge Street,
North York Ontario M2P2B5
Phone: (416) 861-7411
Fax: (416) 861-7491
Address: kensington eye institute
340 college street
Toronto Ontario M5T 3A9
Phone: (416) 928-2132
Fax: (416) 928-6607
Address: Dept. of Ophthalmology, Sick Kids
555 University Ave.
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7374
Fax: (416) 813-7040

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Radha Kohly Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Mar 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kohly (CPSO#: 80896 ) Dr. R. Muni (CPSO#: 77808 )

Corporation Name: Dr. Rajeev Muni Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Nov 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kohly (CPSO#: 80896 ) Dr. R. Muni (CPSO#: 77808 )
Business Address: Hospital for Sick Children
Eye Clinic
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
(416) 813-7374
Business Address: Kensington Eye Institute
340 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 3A9
(416) 928-2123
Business Address: 110B-4100 Yonge Street
North York Ontario M2P 2B7
(416) 867-7411
Business Address: St. Michael's Hospital
Room 8-043
8 Cardinal Carter South
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 867-7411

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GUJARATI, HINDI
Medical School: McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michael's Hospital
Dept of Ophthalmology & Vision Sci
Suite 801
61 Queen Street East
Toronto Ontario M5C 2T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 867-7411
Fax: (416) 867-7491
Address: 4100 Yonge Street,
North York Ontario M2P2B5
Phone: (416) 861-7411
Fax: (416) 861-7491
Address: kensington eye institute
340 college street
Toronto Ontario M5T 3A9
Phone: (416) 928-2132
Fax: (416) 928-6607
Address: Dept. of Ophthalmology, Sick Kids
555 University Ave.
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7374
Fax: (416) 813-7040

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Radha Kohly Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Mar 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kohly (CPSO#: 80896 ) Dr. R. Muni (CPSO#: 77808 )

Corporation Name: Dr. Rajeev Muni Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Nov 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kohly (CPSO#: 80896 ) Dr. R. Muni (CPSO#: 77808 )
Business Address: Hospital for Sick Children
Eye Clinic
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
(416) 813-7374
Business Address: Kensington Eye Institute
340 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 3A9
(416) 928-2123
Business Address: 110B-4100 Yonge Street
North York Ontario M2P 2B7
(416) 867-7411
Business Address: St. Michael's Hospital
Room 8-043
8 Cardinal Carter South
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 867-7411

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAJEEV HEMANT MUNI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUNI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAJEEV HEMANT MUNI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUNI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Aug 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002