THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 06:06:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8440 112 St NW
University of Alberta Hospital
Child & Adol Psychiatry
1E1
Edmonton AB T6G 2B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7804072114
Fax: 7804077721
Address: 11642 142 St NW
Youth Addiction Services Edmonton
Psychiatry
Suite 300
Edmonton AB T5M 1V4
Phone: 7804227383
Fax: 7804088776
Address: Windsor Region Hospital - Ouellette
Jeanne Marce Building
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 973-4411
Extension: 33354
Fax: (519) 973-0210

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 31 Jul 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 31 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rachel L. Burdett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Burdett (CPSO#: 77819 )
Business Address: 1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
(519) 973-4411
Business Address: 194 Talbot Street West
Leamington Ontario N8H 1N9
(519) 800-5533

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8440 112 St NW
University of Alberta Hospital
Child & Adol Psychiatry
1E1
Edmonton AB T6G 2B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7804072114
Fax: 7804077721
Address: 11642 142 St NW
Youth Addiction Services Edmonton
Psychiatry
Suite 300
Edmonton AB T5M 1V4
Phone: 7804227383
Fax: 7804088776
Address: Windsor Region Hospital - Ouellette
Jeanne Marce Building
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 973-4411
Extension: 33354
Fax: (519) 973-0210

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 31 Jul 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 31 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rachel L. Burdett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Burdett (CPSO#: 77819 )
Business Address: 1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
(519) 973-4411
Business Address: 194 Talbot Street West
Leamington Ontario N8H 1N9
(519) 800-5533

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RACHEL L BURDETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURDETT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RACHEL L BURDETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURDETT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002