THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:08:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1001 Queen St W
Centre for Addiction and Mental Health
Forensic Psychiatry
Toronto ON M6J 1H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-535-8501
Extension: 32835
Fax: 647-847-3604
Address: 700 Gordon St
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences
Forensic Psychiatry
Whitby ON L1N 5S9
Phone: 9056685881
Extension: 6893
Fax: 647-847-3604

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Forensic Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Sep 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Forensic Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences Whitby
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences
LOCATION: Whitby

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mark Pearce Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jan 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Pearce (CPSO#: 77834 )
Business Address: Centre for Addiction and Mental Health
Unit 3 - 4
1001 Queen Street West
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
(416) 535-8501
Business Address: 700 Gordon Street
Suite 7-2
Whitby Ontario L1N 5S9
(905) 668-5881

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1001 Queen St W
Centre for Addiction and Mental Health
Forensic Psychiatry
Toronto ON M6J 1H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-535-8501
Extension: 32835
Fax: 647-847-3604
Address: 700 Gordon St
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences
Forensic Psychiatry
Whitby ON L1N 5S9
Phone: 9056685881
Extension: 6893
Fax: 647-847-3604

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Forensic Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Sep 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Forensic Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences Whitby
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences
LOCATION: Whitby

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mark Pearce Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jan 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Pearce (CPSO#: 77834 )
Business Address: Centre for Addiction and Mental Health
Unit 3 - 4
1001 Queen Street West
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
(416) 535-8501
Business Address: 700 Gordon Street
Suite 7-2
Whitby Ontario L1N 5S9
(905) 668-5881

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK ALLAN PEARCE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEARCE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK ALLAN PEARCE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEARCE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002