THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:33:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Niagara Health St. Catharines Site
1200 Fourth Avenue
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Extension: 45000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 145 Queenston Street
St. Catharines Ontario L2R 2Z7
Phone: 905 688-2558
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 29 Nov 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T.A. St. Amand Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. T. St. Amand (CPSO#: 77846 )
Business Address: 145 Queenston Street
St Catharines Ontario L2R 2Z7
(905) 688-2558
Business Address: 1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
(905) 378-4647 Extn: 45000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Niagara Health St. Catharines Site
1200 Fourth Avenue
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Extension: 45000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 145 Queenston Street
St. Catharines Ontario L2R 2Z7
Phone: 905 688-2558
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 29 Nov 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T.A. St. Amand Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. T. St. Amand (CPSO#: 77846 )
Business Address: 145 Queenston Street
St Catharines Ontario L2R 2Z7
(905) 688-2558
Business Address: 1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
(905) 378-4647 Extn: 45000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TIMOTHY ANDRE ST. AMAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ST. AMAND is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TIMOTHY ANDRE ST. AMAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ST. AMAND is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002