THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
27/04/25 21:03:18 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 167 Rolph St
Tillsonburg ON N4G 3Y9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-842-3611
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Dentistry Canada - Ontario
PROFESSION: Dentistry
JURISDICTION: Canada - Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

HOSPITAL: Alexandra Marine and General Hospital
LOCATION: Goderich

HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

HOSPITAL: Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Tillsonburg

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kanna Narayanan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Narayanan (CPSO#: 77855 )
Business Address: 11 Highland Pl
London ON N6C 5E7
5197848335
Business Address: Chatham Kent Health Alliance
80 Grand Avenue
Chatham Ontario N7M 5L9
(519) 352-6400 Extn: 6050
Business Address: Woodstock General Hospital
310 Julian Drive
Woodstock Ontario N4V 0A4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 167 Rolph St
Tillsonburg ON N4G 3Y9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-842-3611
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Dentistry Canada - Ontario
PROFESSION: Dentistry
JURISDICTION: Canada - Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

HOSPITAL: Alexandra Marine and General Hospital
LOCATION: Goderich

HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

HOSPITAL: Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Tillsonburg

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kanna Narayanan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Narayanan (CPSO#: 77855 )
Business Address: 11 Highland Pl
London ON N6C 5E7
5197848335
Business Address: Chatham Kent Health Alliance
80 Grand Avenue
Chatham Ontario N7M 5L9
(519) 352-6400 Extn: 6050
Business Address: Woodstock General Hospital
310 Julian Drive
Woodstock Ontario N4V 0A4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KANNA RANGANATHAN SATYA NARAYANAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NARAYANAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KANNA RANGANATHAN SATYA NARAYANAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NARAYANAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 30 May 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 May 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 30 May 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002