THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:33:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Scarborough Health Network
Centenary Site
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 4B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 281-7270
Fax: No Information Available
Address: N/A - house calls
Toronto Ontario M5V2Y1
Phone: (647) 497-7453
Fax: 855-632-4962

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Canada - New Brunswick
Canada - Prince Edward Island

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brett Belchetz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Apr 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Belchetz (CPSO#: 77893 )
Business Address: Rouge Valley Centenary Hospital
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
(416) 281-7404

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Scarborough Health Network
Centenary Site
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 4B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 281-7270
Fax: No Information Available
Address: N/A - house calls
Toronto Ontario M5V2Y1
Phone: (647) 497-7453
Fax: 855-632-4962

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Canada - New Brunswick
Canada - Prince Edward Island

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brett Belchetz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Apr 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Belchetz (CPSO#: 77893 )
Business Address: Rouge Valley Centenary Hospital
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
(416) 281-7404

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRETT BELCHETZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELCHETZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRETT BELCHETZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELCHETZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 14 Dec 2016
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 14 Dec 2016
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002