THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:37:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1018 Pape Ave
Pape Medical Centre
Family Practice
Main Floor
East York ON M4K 3V9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 467 1567
Fax: 1 855 615 2919
Address: 1324 Danforth Ave
Danforth Pain Clinic
Chronic pain management
Main Floor
Toronto ON M4J 1M9
Phone: 416 849 2230
Fax: 416 849 2231

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher Aldridge Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Nov 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Aldridge (CPSO#: 77901 )
Business Address: 2772 Danforth Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 1L7
(416) 690-1042
Business Address: Family Practice and Chronic Pain Management
202 - 688 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3B7
(416) 463-4632
Business Address: 1018 Pape Ave
Pape Medical Centre
Family Practice
Main Floor
East York ON M4K 3V9
416 467 1567
Business Address: 1324 Danforth Ave
Danforth Pain Clinic
Chronic pain management
Main Floor
Toronto ON M4J 1M9
416 849 2230

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1018 Pape Ave
Pape Medical Centre
Family Practice
Main Floor
East York ON M4K 3V9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 467 1567
Fax: 1 855 615 2919
Address: 1324 Danforth Ave
Danforth Pain Clinic
Chronic pain management
Main Floor
Toronto ON M4J 1M9
Phone: 416 849 2230
Fax: 416 849 2231

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher Aldridge Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Nov 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Aldridge (CPSO#: 77901 )
Business Address: 2772 Danforth Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 1L7
(416) 690-1042
Business Address: Family Practice and Chronic Pain Management
202 - 688 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3B7
(416) 463-4632
Business Address: 1018 Pape Ave
Pape Medical Centre
Family Practice
Main Floor
East York ON M4K 3V9
416 467 1567
Business Address: 1324 Danforth Ave
Danforth Pain Clinic
Chronic pain management
Main Floor
Toronto ON M4J 1M9
416 849 2230

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER JOHN ALDRIDGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALDRIDGE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER JOHN ALDRIDGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALDRIDGE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002