THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 14:25:07 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Etobicoke Walk-In
& Family Physicians
Suite 106
100 Humber College
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 5G4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 742-9449
Fax: (416) 742-6963
Address: Horizons - Opioid Treatment Service
279 Queen Street East
Brampton Ontario L6T 4P9
Phone: 1-855-742-9449
Fax: (855) 742-5300
Address: Horizons - Opioid Treatment Service
2050 Mount Forest Drive
Burlington Ontario L7P 1H4
Phone: 1-855-742-9449
Fax: (855) 742-5300
Address: 1560 Dundas Street
London Ontario N5W 3C1
Phone: 1-855-742-9449
Fax: 855-742-5300
Address: Horizons - Opioid Treatment Service
1428 Ouellette Ave
Windsor Ontario N8X 5B2
Phone: 1-855-742-9449
Fax: (855) 742-5300

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jameet Bawa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jun 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bawa (CPSO#: 77905 )
Business Address: 106 - 100 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 5G4
(416) 742-9449

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Etobicoke Walk-In
& Family Physicians
Suite 106
100 Humber College
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 5G4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 742-9449
Fax: (416) 742-6963
Address: Horizons - Opioid Treatment Service
279 Queen Street East
Brampton Ontario L6T 4P9
Phone: 1-855-742-9449
Fax: (855) 742-5300
Address: Horizons - Opioid Treatment Service
2050 Mount Forest Drive
Burlington Ontario L7P 1H4
Phone: 1-855-742-9449
Fax: (855) 742-5300
Address: 1560 Dundas Street
London Ontario N5W 3C1
Phone: 1-855-742-9449
Fax: 855-742-5300
Address: Horizons - Opioid Treatment Service
1428 Ouellette Ave
Windsor Ontario N8X 5B2
Phone: 1-855-742-9449
Fax: (855) 742-5300

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jameet Bawa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jun 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bawa (CPSO#: 77905 )
Business Address: 106 - 100 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 5G4
(416) 742-9449

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMEET BAWA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAWA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMEET BAWA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAWA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002