THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:20:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Durham Regional Cancer Centre
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Extension: x32804
Fax: 905-721-6101
Address: 1000 Depalma Dr
Cobourg Ontario K9A5W6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: The Scarborough Hospital
3050 Lawrence ave E
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2T7
Phone: (416) 431-8113
Fax: 416-431-8279

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 17 Sep 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Dec 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Orit Freedman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Freedman (CPSO#: 77925 )
Business Address: 3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2T7
(416) 431-8113
Business Address: Durham Regional Cancer Centre
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Durham Regional Cancer Centre
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Extension: x32804
Fax: 905-721-6101
Address: 1000 Depalma Dr
Cobourg Ontario K9A5W6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: The Scarborough Hospital
3050 Lawrence ave E
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2T7
Phone: (416) 431-8113
Fax: 416-431-8279

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 17 Sep 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Dec 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Orit Freedman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Freedman (CPSO#: 77925 )
Business Address: 3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2T7
(416) 431-8113
Business Address: Durham Regional Cancer Centre
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ORIT CHAYA FREEDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREEDMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ORIT CHAYA FREEDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREEDMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002