THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 04:53:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Bridgepoint Dr
Sinai Health
Hennick Bridgepoint Hospital
Toronto ON M4M 2B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-461-8252
Extension: 3709
Fax: 416-461-2089

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Sep 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Bridgepoint Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Omar Ghaffar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Apr 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Ghaffar (CPSO#: 77927 )
Business Address: 1 Bridgepoint Drive
Toronto Ontario M4M 2B5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Bridgepoint Dr
Sinai Health
Hennick Bridgepoint Hospital
Toronto ON M4M 2B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-461-8252
Extension: 3709
Fax: 416-461-2089

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Sep 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Bridgepoint Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Omar Ghaffar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Apr 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Ghaffar (CPSO#: 77927 )
Business Address: 1 Bridgepoint Drive
Toronto Ontario M4M 2B5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OMAR GHAFFAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHAFFAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OMAR GHAFFAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHAFFAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002