THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:48:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 353 St Paul Avenue
2nd Floor
Brantford Ontario N3R 4N3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 512-0058
Fax: (519) 512-0611
Address: 200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 02 Oct 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 02 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mark Jones Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Jones (CPSO#: 77938 )
Business Address: 200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
(519) 752-7871
Business Address: 353 St. Paul Avenue
2nd Floor
Brantford Ontario N3R 4N3
(519) 512-0058

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 353 St Paul Avenue
2nd Floor
Brantford Ontario N3R 4N3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 512-0058
Fax: (519) 512-0611
Address: 200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 02 Oct 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 02 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mark Jones Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Jones (CPSO#: 77938 )
Business Address: 200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
(519) 752-7871
Business Address: 353 St. Paul Avenue
2nd Floor
Brantford Ontario N3R 4N3
(519) 512-0058

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK BRADLEY JONES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JONES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK BRADLEY JONES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JONES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002