THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 04:38:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Scarborough Hospital - Birchmount
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough Ontario M1W 3W3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 495-2600
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Canada
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-6060
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 19 Sep 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 19 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joseph Ly Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Feb 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ly (CPSO#: 77958 )
Business Address: St Michael's Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 864-5228
Business Address: Scarborough Hospital - Birchmount
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough Ontario M1W 3W3
(416) 495-2600

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Scarborough Hospital - Birchmount
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough Ontario M1W 3W3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 495-2600
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Canada
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-6060
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 19 Sep 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 19 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joseph Ly Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Feb 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ly (CPSO#: 77958 )
Business Address: St Michael's Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 864-5228
Business Address: Scarborough Hospital - Birchmount
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough Ontario M1W 3W3
(416) 495-2600

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSEPH PANG HOI LY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSEPH PANG HOI LY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002