THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:51:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hamilton General Hospital
Room 508 5 North
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 527-4322
Extension: 44652
Fax: (905) 529-8946
Address: Oakville Vascular
2035 Cornwall Road
Oakville Ontario L6J 7S2
Phone: (905) 815-0999
Fax: (905)815-0997

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Theodore Rapanos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 May 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Rapanos (CPSO#: 77975 )
Business Address: Room 508 5 North
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 527-4322 Extn: 44652
Business Address: 711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
(905) 527-0271 Extn: 44652
Business Address: 18 - 1525 Cornwall Road
Oakville Ontario L6J 0B2
(905) 815-0999
Business Address: Suite 400
849 Upper Wentworth Street
Hamilton Ontario L9A 5H4
(905) 538-2262
Business Address: 50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-1155

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hamilton General Hospital
Room 508 5 North
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 527-4322
Extension: 44652
Fax: (905) 529-8946
Address: Oakville Vascular
2035 Cornwall Road
Oakville Ontario L6J 7S2
Phone: (905) 815-0999
Fax: (905)815-0997

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Theodore Rapanos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 May 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Rapanos (CPSO#: 77975 )
Business Address: Room 508 5 North
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 527-4322 Extn: 44652
Business Address: 711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
(905) 527-0271 Extn: 44652
Business Address: 18 - 1525 Cornwall Road
Oakville Ontario L6J 0B2
(905) 815-0999
Business Address: Suite 400
849 Upper Wentworth Street
Hamilton Ontario L9A 5H4
(905) 538-2262
Business Address: 50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-1155

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THEODORE RAPANOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAPANOS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THEODORE RAPANOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAPANOS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jul 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002