THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:28:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 16945 Leslie Street
Unit 44
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 9A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 235-8055
Fax: (855) 203-1060
Address: Suite 230
1101 Kingston Road
Pickering Ontario L1V 1B5
Phone: (289) 624-1789
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Unit 410
955 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Richmond Hill Ontario L6A 4P9
Phone: (289) 963-1717
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Asif Salyani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Apr 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Salyani (CPSO#: 77980 )
Business Address: 16945 Leslie Street
Unit 44
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 9A2
(905) 235-8055
Business Address: 230 - 1101 Kingston Road
Pickering Ontario L1V 1B5
(905) 235-8055
Business Address: 410 - 955 Major Mackenzie Drive
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4P9
(905) 235-8055

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 16945 Leslie Street
Unit 44
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 9A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 235-8055
Fax: (855) 203-1060
Address: Suite 230
1101 Kingston Road
Pickering Ontario L1V 1B5
Phone: (289) 624-1789
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Unit 410
955 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Richmond Hill Ontario L6A 4P9
Phone: (289) 963-1717
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Asif Salyani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Apr 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Salyani (CPSO#: 77980 )
Business Address: 16945 Leslie Street
Unit 44
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 9A2
(905) 235-8055
Business Address: 230 - 1101 Kingston Road
Pickering Ontario L1V 1B5
(905) 235-8055
Business Address: 410 - 955 Major Mackenzie Drive
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4P9
(905) 235-8055

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMED ASIF SALYANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALYANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMED ASIF SALYANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALYANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 May 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 May 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 May 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Nov 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 22 Nov 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 May 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002