THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:43:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 268 Grosvenor Street
Room # F2-565
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-455-5110
Extension: 47119
Fax: 519-455-9879

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tanya H. Thornton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Thornton (CPSO#: 77994 )
Business Address: 210-279 Wharncliffe Road North
McDonagh Immigration,  Wharncliffe Health Centre
London Ontario N6H 2C2
519-859-8987

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 268 Grosvenor Street
Room # F2-565
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-455-5110
Extension: 47119
Fax: 519-455-9879

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tanya H. Thornton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Thornton (CPSO#: 77994 )
Business Address: 210-279 Wharncliffe Road North
McDonagh Immigration,  Wharncliffe Health Centre
London Ontario N6H 2C2
519-859-8987

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TANYA HELEN THORNTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THORNTON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TANYA HELEN THORNTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THORNTON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002