THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:50:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 351 Frances St
Strathroy Caradoc Family Medicine
Strathroy ON N7G 2L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2267268440
Fax: 5199133899

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vanderzwan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 May 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Vanderzwan (CPSO#: 78002 )
Business Address: Strathroy Medical Clinic
74 Front Street East
Strathroy Ontario N7G 1Y7
(519) 245-0430
Business Address: 351 Frances St
Strathroy Caradoc Family Medicine
Strathroy ON N7G 2L7
226-726-8440

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 351 Frances St
Strathroy Caradoc Family Medicine
Strathroy ON N7G 2L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2267268440
Fax: 5199133899

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vanderzwan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 May 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Vanderzwan (CPSO#: 78002 )
Business Address: Strathroy Medical Clinic
74 Front Street East
Strathroy Ontario N7G 1Y7
(519) 245-0430
Business Address: 351 Frances St
Strathroy Caradoc Family Medicine
Strathroy ON N7G 2L7
226-726-8440

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JONAS BLUE VANDERZWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VANDERZWAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JONAS BLUE VANDERZWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VANDERZWAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002