THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/04/25 08:36:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1881 Yonge St
suite 614
Toronto ON M4S 3C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6473450661
Fax: 2893720463

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wiesenthal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jun 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Wiesenthal (CPSO#: 78005 )
Business Address: 1739 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5P 3K5
(647) 345-0661
Business Address: Toronto East General Hospital
Dept of Child Psychiatry
825 Coxwell Avenue
A-614
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
(416) 469-6580 Extn: 3464

Corporation Name: Marvin M. Wiesenthal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 28 Sep 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1881 Yonge St
suite 614
Toronto ON M4S 3C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6473450661
Fax: 2893720463

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wiesenthal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jun 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Wiesenthal (CPSO#: 78005 )
Business Address: 1739 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5P 3K5
(647) 345-0661
Business Address: Toronto East General Hospital
Dept of Child Psychiatry
825 Coxwell Avenue
A-614
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
(416) 469-6580 Extn: 3464

Corporation Name: Marvin M. Wiesenthal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 28 Sep 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHANIE RENEE WIESENTHAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WIESENTHAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHANIE RENEE WIESENTHAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WIESENTHAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002