THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:57:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Guelph Renal Clinic, Grand River
Hospital
73 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 6L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 822-7664
Fax: (519) 822-0701

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 19 Sep 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 19 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
St Joseph's Health Centre, Guelph Guelph
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre, Guelph
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Oded Friedman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Friedman (CPSO#: 78017 )
Business Address: Grand River Hospital
Guelph Renal Clinic
73 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 6L9
(519) 822-7664

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Guelph Renal Clinic, Grand River
Hospital
73 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 6L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 822-7664
Fax: (519) 822-0701

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 19 Sep 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 19 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
St Joseph's Health Centre, Guelph Guelph
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre, Guelph
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Oded Friedman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Friedman (CPSO#: 78017 )
Business Address: Grand River Hospital
Guelph Renal Clinic
73 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 6L9
(519) 822-7664

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ODED FRIEDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRIEDMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ODED FRIEDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRIEDMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002