THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 04:25:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: (613) 738-8400
Extension: 82526
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Ottawa Hospital Research Institute
2-014 Administrative Services Build
Box 693
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Extension: 17176
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 19 Sep 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 19 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Manish M. Sood Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sood (CPSO#: 78018 )
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital Research Institute
University of Ottawa
2-014 Administrative Sevices Building
Box 693 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 798-5555 Extn: 17176

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: (613) 738-8400
Extension: 82526
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Ottawa Hospital Research Institute
2-014 Administrative Services Build
Box 693
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Extension: 17176
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 19 Sep 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 19 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Manish M. Sood Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sood (CPSO#: 78018 )
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital Research Institute
University of Ottawa
2-014 Administrative Sevices Building
Box 693 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 798-5555 Extn: 17176

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MANISH MICHEAL SOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOOD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MANISH MICHEAL SOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOOD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 10 Aug 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 2007

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002