THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 05:07:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1995
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Division of Cardiac Anaesthesiology
Univ of Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street H213
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 6967381
Fax: (613) 6967099

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 28 Jul 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 28 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University of Ottawa Heart Institute Ottawa
HOSPITAL: University of Ottawa Heart Institute
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Donna Nicholson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Nov 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Nicholson (CPSO#: 78028 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Division of Cardiac Anaesthesiology
Univ of Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street H213
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 6967381
Fax: (613) 6967099

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 28 Jul 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 28 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University of Ottawa Heart Institute Ottawa
HOSPITAL: University of Ottawa Heart Institute
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Donna Nicholson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Nov 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Nicholson (CPSO#: 78028 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DONNA JANE NICHOLSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NICHOLSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DONNA JANE NICHOLSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NICHOLSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Mar 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002