THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 04:37:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
Geriatric Psychiatry
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7K4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 722-6521
Extension: 6950
Fax: 613-798-2999
Address: 7 St Francis Memorial Drive
Barry's Bay
Barry's Bay Ontario K0J 1B0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Notre Dame Hospital
1405 Edward Street
Hearst Ontario P0L 1N0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101 Progress Crescent
Kapuskasing
Kapuskasing Ontario P5N 3H5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: North Bay Regional Health Centre
1164 Devonshire Ave
North Bay Ontario P1B 6X7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: TOH General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8M2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Sep 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barry's Bay
Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst) Hearst
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

HOSPITAL: St Francis Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Barry's Bay

HOSPITAL: Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst)
LOCATION: Hearst

HOSPITAL: Sensenbrenner Hospital
LOCATION: Kapuskasing

HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrea Stewart Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Stewart (CPSO#: 78043 )
Business Address: Notre-Dame Hospital
1405 Edward Street
Hearst Ontario P0L 1N0
Business Address: The Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7K4
(613) 722-6521
Business Address: North Bay Regional
50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B 5A4
Business Address: Hawkesbury General Hospital
1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury Ontario K6A 3G5
Business Address: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
Geriatric Psychiatry
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7K4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 722-6521
Extension: 6950
Fax: 613-798-2999
Address: 7 St Francis Memorial Drive
Barry's Bay
Barry's Bay Ontario K0J 1B0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Notre Dame Hospital
1405 Edward Street
Hearst Ontario P0L 1N0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101 Progress Crescent
Kapuskasing
Kapuskasing Ontario P5N 3H5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: North Bay Regional Health Centre
1164 Devonshire Ave
North Bay Ontario P1B 6X7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: TOH General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8M2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Sep 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barry's Bay
Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst) Hearst
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

HOSPITAL: St Francis Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Barry's Bay

HOSPITAL: Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst)
LOCATION: Hearst

HOSPITAL: Sensenbrenner Hospital
LOCATION: Kapuskasing

HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrea Stewart Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Stewart (CPSO#: 78043 )
Business Address: Notre-Dame Hospital
1405 Edward Street
Hearst Ontario P0L 1N0
Business Address: The Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7K4
(613) 722-6521
Business Address: North Bay Regional
50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B 5A4
Business Address: Hawkesbury General Hospital
1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury Ontario K6A 3G5
Business Address: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREA KIRSTEN STEWART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEWART is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREA KIRSTEN STEWART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEWART is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Oct 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002