THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:25:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Asyut University, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bonis-Birchmount Medical Clinic
5 Bonis Avenue
Scarborough Ontario M1T 2T9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 335-0077
Fax: (416) 335-9277

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Henis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Oct 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Henis (CPSO#: 78052 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Asyut University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bonis-Birchmount Medical Clinic
5 Bonis Avenue
Scarborough Ontario M1T 2T9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 335-0077
Fax: (416) 335-9277

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Henis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Oct 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Henis (CPSO#: 78052 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHSEN SHENOUDA HANNA HENIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HENIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHSEN SHENOUDA HANNA HENIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HENIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Asyut University, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Nov 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Dec 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002