THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:16:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Colombo, 1981
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Meadowlands Family Health Centre
Unit 5
35 Stone Church Road
Ancaster Ontario L9K 1S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 648-8999
Fax: (905) 648-8969

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Namburi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jun 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Namburi (CPSO#: 78069 )
Business Address: 5 - 35 Stone Church Road
Ancaster Ontario L9K 1S5
(905) 648-8999

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: University of Colombo, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Meadowlands Family Health Centre
Unit 5
35 Stone Church Road
Ancaster Ontario L9K 1S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 648-8999
Fax: (905) 648-8969

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Namburi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jun 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Namburi (CPSO#: 78069 )
Business Address: 5 - 35 Stone Church Road
Ancaster Ontario L9K 1S5
(905) 648-8999

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SRIRANJINEE SURENDRAKUMAR NAMBURI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAMBURI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SRIRANJINEE SURENDRAKUMAR NAMBURI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAMBURI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Colombo, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002