THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:36:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Rideau Valley Health Centre
1221 Greenbank Road
Ottawa Ontario K2J 5V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 258-8710
Fax: (613) 440-3238

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Dec 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sheri Boyden Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 May 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Boyden (CPSO#: 78086 )
Business Address: 1221 Greenbank Road
Ottawa Ontario K2J 5V7
343-644-9877

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Rideau Valley Health Centre
1221 Greenbank Road
Ottawa Ontario K2J 5V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 258-8710
Fax: (613) 440-3238

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Dec 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sheri Boyden Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 May 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Boyden (CPSO#: 78086 )
Business Address: 1221 Greenbank Road
Ottawa Ontario K2J 5V7
343-644-9877

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHERI NADINE BOYDEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOYDEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHERI NADINE BOYDEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOYDEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Nov 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002