THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 04:59:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: Shaikh, Azhar Allison (Used Until: 13 Jan 2016)
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Allison Schaik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Apr 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Schaik (CPSO#: 78099 )
Business Address: Timmins & District Hospital
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins Ontario P4N 8P2
(226) 268-0489

General Information

Former Name: Shaikh, Azhar Allison (Used Until: 13 Jan 2016)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Allison Schaik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Apr 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Schaik (CPSO#: 78099 )
Business Address: Timmins & District Hospital
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins Ontario P4N 8P2
(226) 268-0489

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALLISON SCHAIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHAIK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALLISON SCHAIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHAIK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002