THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:32:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the West Indies, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2760 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4N 2J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 481-1173
Fax: (416) 481-7431

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr.Natashia Grell Medicine Professional corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jul 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Grell (CPSO#: 78101 )
Business Address: 2760 Yonge St
Toronto ON M4N 2J2
4164811173

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of the West Indies, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2760 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4N 2J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 481-1173
Fax: (416) 481-7431

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr.Natashia Grell Medicine Professional corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jul 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Grell (CPSO#: 78101 )
Business Address: 2760 Yonge St
Toronto ON M4N 2J2
4164811173

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATASHIA GAIL KATHLEEN GRELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRELL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATASHIA GAIL KATHLEEN GRELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRELL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the West Indies, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Sep 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002