THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:47:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical College of Virginia, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 195 Avenue Road
Toronto Ontario M5R 2J3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 929-6609
Fax: (416) 929-0736
Address: Oakridges Surgical Centre
Suite 401
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 4L6
Phone: (905) 773-1599
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Dentistry Canada - Ontario
PROFESSION: Dentistry
JURISDICTION: Canada - Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ali Adibfar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Dec 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Adibfar (CPSO#: 78102 )
Business Address: 401 - 13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 4L6
(905) 773-1599 Extn: 2306
Business Address: 195 Avenue Road
Toronto Ontario M5R 2J3
(416) 929-6609

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, FARSI
Medical School: Medical College of Virginia, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 195 Avenue Road
Toronto Ontario M5R 2J3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 929-6609
Fax: (416) 929-0736
Address: Oakridges Surgical Centre
Suite 401
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 4L6
Phone: (905) 773-1599
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Dentistry Canada - Ontario
PROFESSION: Dentistry
JURISDICTION: Canada - Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ali Adibfar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Dec 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Adibfar (CPSO#: 78102 )
Business Address: 401 - 13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 4L6
(905) 773-1599 Extn: 2306
Business Address: 195 Avenue Road
Toronto Ontario M5R 2J3
(416) 929-6609

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALI ADIBFAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADIBFAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALI ADIBFAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADIBFAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical College of Virginia, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jul 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002