THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:51:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad Autonoma de Centro America, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Extension: 3467
Fax: (613) 738-4879

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 22 Feb 2008
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 22 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sell Marucco Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Sell Marucco (CPSO#: 78114 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Universidad Autonoma de Centro America, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Extension: 3467
Fax: (613) 738-4879

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 22 Feb 2008
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 22 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sell Marucco Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Sell Marucco (CPSO#: 78114 )

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
02 Sep 2015
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 02 2015
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Erick Fernando Sell Marucco may practise medicine independently in
paediatric neurology.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Erick Fernando Sell Marucco may practise medicine independently in
paediatric neurology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad Autonoma de Centro America, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 02 Sep 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 02 Sep 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 23 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 11 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 02 Sep 2015

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 02 Sep 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 11 Dec 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Feb 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Feb 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2007

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002