THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 21:45:46 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Guru Nanak Dev University, 1995
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 01 Jul 2007
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sandeep Ghai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jul 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ghai (CPSO#: 78121 )
Business Address: Princess Margaret Hospital
Department of Breast Imaging
3rd Floor
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
Business Address: New Women's College Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
(416) 323-6400 Extn: 4443
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
12th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5

Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Apr 2017

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Guru Nanak Dev University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 01 Jul 2007
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sandeep Ghai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jul 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ghai (CPSO#: 78121 )
Business Address: Princess Margaret Hospital
Department of Breast Imaging
3rd Floor
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
Business Address: New Women's College Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
(416) 323-6400 Extn: 4443
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
12th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5

Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Apr 2017

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
28 May 2014
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 28 2014
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Sandeep Ghai may practise medicine independently in diagnostic radiology
limited to breast imaging, only.



VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Sandeep Ghai may practise medicine independently in diagnostic radiology
limited to breast imaging, only.



Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Guru Nanak Dev University, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 28 May 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 28 May 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 30 Apr 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 28 May 2014

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 28 May 2014

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002