THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:06:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 1980
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 825 Don Mills Rd
Don Mills Medical Clinic
North York, ON, M3C 1V4
North York ON M3C 1V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 383 1251
Fax: 416 383 6084
Address: 1640 Bloor St. W.
Unite 5
MedVisit
Toronto Ontario M6P 1A7
Phone: 416 631 3000
Fax: 416 631 0613

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Samuil Fidal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Fidal (CPSO#: 78140 )
Business Address: 1640 Bloor St. W
MedVisit
Toronto Ontario M6P 1A7
416 631 3000
Business Address: 825 Don Mills Rd.
Don Mills Medical Clinic
North York Ontario M3C 1V4
416 383 1251

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 825 Don Mills Rd
Don Mills Medical Clinic
North York, ON, M3C 1V4
North York ON M3C 1V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 383 1251
Fax: 416 383 6084
Address: 1640 Bloor St. W.
Unite 5
MedVisit
Toronto Ontario M6P 1A7
Phone: 416 631 3000
Fax: 416 631 0613

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Samuil Fidal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Fidal (CPSO#: 78140 )
Business Address: 1640 Bloor St. W
MedVisit
Toronto Ontario M6P 1A7
416 631 3000
Business Address: 825 Don Mills Rd.
Don Mills Medical Clinic
North York Ontario M3C 1V4
416 383 1251

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMUIL WADIE FIDAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FIDAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMUIL WADIE FIDAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FIDAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jan 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Apr 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jan 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002