THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:36:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Al-Arab Medical University, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 106
2425 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor Ontario N8W 1E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 254-5763
Fax: (519) 254-6356
Address: 13278 tecumseh r east
Tecumseh Ontario N8N 3T6
Phone: (519) 254-5763
Fax: (519) 254-6356

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abdelrahman Elashaal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Elashaal (CPSO#: 78151 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Al-Arab Medical University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 106
2425 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor Ontario N8W 1E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 254-5763
Fax: (519) 254-6356
Address: 13278 tecumseh r east
Tecumseh Ontario N8N 3T6
Phone: (519) 254-5763
Fax: (519) 254-6356

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abdelrahman Elashaal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Elashaal (CPSO#: 78151 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABDELRAHMAN ABDALLAH BARAKA ELASHAAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELASHAAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABDELRAHMAN ABDALLAH BARAKA ELASHAAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELASHAAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Al-Arab Medical University, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 May 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 May 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 01 May 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Dec 2007

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Dec 2007

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Feb 2003
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Feb 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002