THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:24:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Pune, 1989
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Joseph Brant Hospital Cancer Clinic
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 336-4103
Fax: (905) 336-6492
Address: Juravanski Cancer Center & Hospital
699-711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 5C2
Phone: (905) 387-9495
Extension: 67677
Fax: 905-575-6326

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 19 Sep 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 19 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Callista Phillips Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Phillips (CPSO#: 78154 )
Business Address: Juravinski Hospital
699-711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 5C2
(905) 389-4411 Extn: 43395
Business Address: Joseph Brant Hospital Cancer Clinic
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington Ontario L7S 1W7
(905) 336-4103

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Pune, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Joseph Brant Hospital Cancer Clinic
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 336-4103
Fax: (905) 336-6492
Address: Juravanski Cancer Center & Hospital
699-711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 5C2
Phone: (905) 387-9495
Extension: 67677
Fax: 905-575-6326

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 19 Sep 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 19 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Callista Phillips Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Phillips (CPSO#: 78154 )
Business Address: Juravinski Hospital
699-711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 5C2
(905) 389-4411 Extn: 43395
Business Address: Joseph Brant Hospital Cancer Clinic
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington Ontario L7S 1W7
(905) 336-4103

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CALLISTA MARIA PHILLIPS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PHILLIPS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CALLISTA MARIA PHILLIPS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PHILLIPS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Pune, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jan 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002