THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 03:53:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: CREDIT VALLEY HOSPITAL
2200 EGLINTON AVE. W
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056457100
Extension: 3291
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Gamma Dynacare Medical Lab
115 MIDAIR COURT
Brampton Ontario L6T 5M3
Phone: 9057903000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ayman Al Habeeb Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Nov 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Al Habeeb (CPSO#: 78163 )
Business Address: Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 645-7100 Extn: 3291

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: CREDIT VALLEY HOSPITAL
2200 EGLINTON AVE. W
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056457100
Extension: 3291
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Gamma Dynacare Medical Lab
115 MIDAIR COURT
Brampton Ontario L6T 5M3
Phone: 9057903000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ayman Al Habeeb Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Nov 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Al Habeeb (CPSO#: 78163 )
Business Address: Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 645-7100 Extn: 3291

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AYMAN SAEED AL HABEEB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL HABEEB is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AYMAN SAEED AL HABEEB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL HABEEB is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Aug 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002