THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:04:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1979
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: MI CLINIC
UNIT E229 A /PO BOX M
5100 Erin Mills Parkway
Mississauga Ontario L5M 4Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 607-2600
Fax: (905) 607-1702

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T. Hussain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Feb 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Hussain (CPSO#: 78200 )
Business Address: 2299-5100 Erin Mills Parkway
Box 80
Mississauga Ontario L5M 4Z5
(905) 607-2600

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: MI CLINIC
UNIT E229 A /PO BOX M
5100 Erin Mills Parkway
Mississauga Ontario L5M 4Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 607-2600
Fax: (905) 607-1702

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T. Hussain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Feb 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Hussain (CPSO#: 78200 )
Business Address: 2299-5100 Erin Mills Parkway
Box 80
Mississauga Ontario L5M 4Z5
(905) 607-2600

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TASNEEM HUSSAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSSAIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TASNEEM HUSSAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSSAIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002