THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:36:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto Cosmetic Surgery Institute
100 Front St., Level B
Toronto Ontario M5J 1E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-360-1975
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1315 Finch Ave W
North York Ontario M3J 2G6
Phone: 416-634-0001
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Downsview Endoscopy
968 Wilson Ave.
North York Ontario M3K 1E7
Phone: (416) 630-7388
Fax: No Information Available
Address: York Diagnostic Centre
3585 Keele St., Unit 4
North York Ontario M3J 3H5
Phone: (416) 398-2288
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 214-10 York Mills Rd
North York Ontario M2P 0A2
Phone: 416-449-9983
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 5400 Yonge Street #110
Toronto Ontario M2N 5R5
Phone: (416) 221-5554
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Toronto Cosmetic Surgery Institute
100 Front St West., Level B
Toronto Ontario M5J 1E3
Phone: (416) 834-6640
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 325 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M4P 1L7
Phone: 647-931-6362
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite 700
59 Hayden St.
Toronto Ontario M4Y2P2
Phone: 6473430207
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 55 York St
Suite 601
Toronto ON M5J 1R7
Phone: 6473522862
Fax: 6473522672

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 May 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S.A. Abbass Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Nov 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Abbass (CPSO#: 78212 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto Cosmetic Surgery Institute
100 Front St., Level B
Toronto Ontario M5J 1E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-360-1975
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1315 Finch Ave W
North York Ontario M3J 2G6
Phone: 416-634-0001
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Downsview Endoscopy
968 Wilson Ave.
North York Ontario M3K 1E7
Phone: (416) 630-7388
Fax: No Information Available
Address: York Diagnostic Centre
3585 Keele St., Unit 4
North York Ontario M3J 3H5
Phone: (416) 398-2288
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 214-10 York Mills Rd
North York Ontario M2P 0A2
Phone: 416-449-9983
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 5400 Yonge Street #110
Toronto Ontario M2N 5R5
Phone: (416) 221-5554
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Toronto Cosmetic Surgery Institute
100 Front St West., Level B
Toronto Ontario M5J 1E3
Phone: (416) 834-6640
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 325 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M4P 1L7
Phone: 647-931-6362
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite 700
59 Hayden St.
Toronto Ontario M4Y2P2
Phone: 6473430207
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 55 York St
Suite 601
Toronto ON M5J 1R7
Phone: 6473522862
Fax: 6473522672

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 May 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S.A. Abbass Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Nov 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Abbass (CPSO#: 78212 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SYED ASGHAR ABBASS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABBASS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SYED ASGHAR ABBASS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABBASS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Sep 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jan 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jan 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 08 Jan 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002