THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:35:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mount Sinai Hospital
Eye clinic
60 Murray Street, Suite 1-040 Box#3
Toronto ON M5T 3L9
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Extension: 5151
Fax: 416-586-8789
Address: 7900 Hurantorio street
unit 401
Brampton Ontario L6Y 0P6
Phone: (905) 456-9500
Fax: (905) 456-9508
Address: 2180 steeles Ave West
Suite 221
Concord Ontario L4K 2Z5
Phone: (905) 761-7002
Fax: (905) 761-7003
Address: suite109 , 2101 Brimley Rd.
Scarborough
Scarborough Ontario M1S 2B4
Phone: 416-292-0330
Fax: 416-292-0331

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fariba Nazemi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 May 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Nazemi (CPSO#: 78228 )
Business Address: Unit 401
7900 Hurontario Street
Brampton Ontario L6Y 0P6
(905) 456-9500

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mount Sinai Hospital
Eye clinic
60 Murray Street, Suite 1-040 Box#3
Toronto ON M5T 3L9
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Extension: 5151
Fax: 416-586-8789
Address: 7900 Hurantorio street
unit 401
Brampton Ontario L6Y 0P6
Phone: (905) 456-9500
Fax: (905) 456-9508
Address: 2180 steeles Ave West
Suite 221
Concord Ontario L4K 2Z5
Phone: (905) 761-7002
Fax: (905) 761-7003
Address: suite109 , 2101 Brimley Rd.
Scarborough
Scarborough Ontario M1S 2B4
Phone: 416-292-0330
Fax: 416-292-0331

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fariba Nazemi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 May 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Nazemi (CPSO#: 78228 )
Business Address: Unit 401
7900 Hurontario Street
Brampton Ontario L6Y 0P6
(905) 456-9500

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FARIBA NAZEMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAZEMI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FARIBA NAZEMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAZEMI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Dec 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002