THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:51:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 5
2 Lakeshore Road
St. Catharines Ontario L2N 7E4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 937-2220
Fax: (905) 937-4404
Address: 6-2 Lakeshore Rd
St. Catharines ON L2N 7E4
Phone: 19056502105
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 12 Sep 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 16 May 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 16 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Saeed Shaikh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Aug 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Shaikh (CPSO#: 78230 )
Business Address: 5 - 2 Lakeshore Road
St Catharines Ontario L2N 7E4
(905) 937-2220

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 5
2 Lakeshore Road
St. Catharines Ontario L2N 7E4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 937-2220
Fax: (905) 937-4404
Address: 6-2 Lakeshore Rd
St. Catharines ON L2N 7E4
Phone: 19056502105
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 12 Sep 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 16 May 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 16 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Saeed Shaikh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Aug 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Shaikh (CPSO#: 78230 )
Business Address: 5 - 2 Lakeshore Road
St Catharines Ontario L2N 7E4
(905) 937-2220

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAEED AHMAD SHAIKH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAIKH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAEED AHMAD SHAIKH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAIKH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2002
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2002