THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 07:24:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Pomeranian Academy of Medicine, 1988
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: WOHC
Oncology Department
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 494-6542
Fax: (905) 494-6416
Address: 100 Rolling Hills Dr.
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X9
Phone: (519) 941-2410
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Balcewicz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Sep 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Balcewicz (CPSO#: 78243 )
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-6542
Business Address: 100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X9
(519) 941-2410

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH
Medical School: Pomeranian Academy of Medicine, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: WOHC
Oncology Department
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 494-6542
Fax: (905) 494-6416
Address: 100 Rolling Hills Dr.
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X9
Phone: (519) 941-2410
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Balcewicz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Sep 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Balcewicz (CPSO#: 78243 )
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-6542
Business Address: 100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X9
(519) 941-2410

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MALGORZATA BALCEWICZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALCEWICZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MALGORZATA BALCEWICZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALCEWICZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Pomeranian Academy of Medicine, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 2002