THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:03:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, PERSIAN, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 111-2680 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough Health Centre
Scarborough ON M1P 4Y4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 755 2242
Fax: 833 563 2242

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 28 May 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 28 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Q. Rana Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Sep 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rana (CPSO#: 78259 )
Business Address: 2680 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough ON M1P 4Y4
647 401 7001

Corporation Name: AFSHAN N. RANA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jul 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rana (CPSO#: 67953 ) Dr. A. Rana (CPSO#: 78259 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, PERSIAN, URDU
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 111-2680 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough Health Centre
Scarborough ON M1P 4Y4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 755 2242
Fax: 833 563 2242

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 28 May 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 28 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Q. Rana Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Sep 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rana (CPSO#: 78259 )
Business Address: 2680 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough ON M1P 4Y4
647 401 7001

Corporation Name: AFSHAN N. RANA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jul 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rana (CPSO#: 67953 ) Dr. A. Rana (CPSO#: 78259 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABDUL QAYYUM RANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABDUL QAYYUM RANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002