THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:06:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Institute of Medicine, Pharmacy,Iasi, 1979
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ROMANIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Extension: 6317
Fax: (905) 853-2222

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2011
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adriana Bida Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Feb 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bida (CPSO#: 78306 )
Business Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ROMANIAN
Medical School: Institute of Medicine, Pharmacy,Iasi, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Extension: 6317
Fax: (905) 853-2222

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2011
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adriana Bida Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Feb 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bida (CPSO#: 78306 )
Business Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADRIANA V BIDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIDA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADRIANA V BIDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIDA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Institute of Medicine, Pharmacy,Iasi, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 2002