THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:13:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ruprecht Karl Univ of Heidelberg, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Two Rivers Family Health Team Inc
Hespeler Clinic
Unit 12
350 Conestoga Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 7L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 629-4615
Fax: (519) 629-4630

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Dec 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 13 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Matthias T. Klomfass Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Klomfass (CPSO#: 78311 )
Business Address: Two Rivers Family Health Team Inc
Hespeler Clinic
B-12 - 350 Conestoga Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 7L7
(519) 629-4615

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN
Medical School: Ruprecht Karl Univ of Heidelberg, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Two Rivers Family Health Team Inc
Hespeler Clinic
Unit 12
350 Conestoga Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 7L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 629-4615
Fax: (519) 629-4630

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Dec 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 13 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Matthias T. Klomfass Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Klomfass (CPSO#: 78311 )
Business Address: Two Rivers Family Health Team Inc
Hespeler Clinic
B-12 - 350 Conestoga Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 7L7
(519) 629-4615

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHIAS THORSTEN KLOMFASS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KLOMFASS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHIAS THORSTEN KLOMFASS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KLOMFASS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ruprecht Karl Univ of Heidelberg, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Apr 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Apr 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 12 Apr 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 2002