THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:45:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Peterborough Clinic
Suite 201
26 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 740-6854
Fax: (705) 740-6865

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 19 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Cindy Cheung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Dec 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Peterborough Clinic
Suite 201
26 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 740-6854
Fax: (705) 740-6865

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 19 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Cindy Cheung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Dec 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CINDY HELEN CHEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEUNG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CINDY HELEN CHEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEUNG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2002
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 2002