THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:52:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Concepcion, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Umedical FHO
Unit 212
600 Sherbourne Street
Toronto Ontario M4X 1W4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 546-3487
Fax: (416) 546-3657

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lorena Barrientos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jun 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Barrientos (CPSO#: 78347 )
Business Address: Rosedale Medical Centre
Unit 212
600 Sherbourne Street
Toronto Ontario M4X 1W4
(416) 546-3487

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: University of Concepcion, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Umedical FHO
Unit 212
600 Sherbourne Street
Toronto Ontario M4X 1W4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 546-3487
Fax: (416) 546-3657

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lorena Barrientos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jun 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Barrientos (CPSO#: 78347 )
Business Address: Rosedale Medical Centre
Unit 212
600 Sherbourne Street
Toronto Ontario M4X 1W4
(416) 546-3487

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LORENA BARRIENTOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARRIENTOS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LORENA BARRIENTOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARRIENTOS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Concepcion, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Aug 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2002
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Aug 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2002