THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:04:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 66 Albert St S
Southampton Ontario N0H 2L0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 483-6000
Fax: (519) 483-6001

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: DocuDavit Solutions: Telephone: 1-888-781-9083, Fax: 1-866-297-9338.
Date Received: 18 Oct 2024

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital Southampton
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital
LOCATION: Southampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Burkhart Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Dec 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Burkhart (CPSO#: 78356 )
Business Address: 66 Albert St S
Southampton ON N0H 2L0

Corporation Name: Chad Burkhart Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 66 Albert St S
Southampton Ontario N0H 2L0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 483-6000
Fax: (519) 483-6001

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: DocuDavit Solutions: Telephone: 1-888-781-9083, Fax: 1-866-297-9338.
Date Received: 18 Oct 2024

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital Southampton
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital
LOCATION: Southampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Burkhart Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Dec 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Burkhart (CPSO#: 78356 )
Business Address: 66 Albert St S
Southampton ON N0H 2L0

Corporation Name: Chad Burkhart Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHADWICK TIMOTHY BURKHART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURKHART is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHADWICK TIMOTHY BURKHART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURKHART is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2002
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jul 2002