THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 05:44:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 390 Queens Quay West
P.O. Box 40086
Toronto Ontario M5V 0A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 862-9824
Fax: (416) 862-9824

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 May 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 06 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Romi Juneja Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Nov 2023

Corporation Name: R. Juneja Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Aug 2011

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 390 Queens Quay West
P.O. Box 40086
Toronto Ontario M5V 0A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 862-9824
Fax: (416) 862-9824

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 May 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 06 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Romi Juneja Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Nov 2023

Corporation Name: R. Juneja Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Aug 2011

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROMI JUNEJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JUNEJA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROMI JUNEJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JUNEJA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Apr 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2002
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Apr 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2002